ID H0135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a declaration of disaster emergency by the Governor.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a declaration of disaster emergency by the Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Override Veto (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Johnson, Patrick Veto Sustained by Senate; Returned to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Burgoyne, Guthrie, Heider, Lamar(Nelson), Lodge, Martin, Nye, Reider(Rabe), Stennett, Ward-Engelking, Wintrow, Woodward Absent and excused |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Burtenshaw, Cook, Crabtree, Den Hartog, Funk(Souza), Grow, Harris, Lakey, Lee, Lent, Rice, Ricks, Riggs, Thayn, Vick, Winder, Zito NAYS |
2021-05-04 | Senate | FAILED 21-12-2 AYES |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate vote to override veto |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House veto overridden |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House veto overridden |
2021-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Erickson, Gibbs, von Ehlinger |
2021-04-21 | House | Berch, Chaney, Chew, Davis(Burns), Gannon, Green, Hartgen, Kauffman, Lickley, Manwaring, Mathias, McCrostie, Nash, Necochea, Rubel, Ruchti, Syme, Toone, Wood Absent |
2021-04-21 | House | Adams, Addis, Amador, Andrus, Armstrong, Barbieri, Blanksma, Boyle, Bundy, Cannon, Christensen, Clow, Crane, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Ehardt, Ferch, Furniss, Galloway, Gestrin, Giddings, Hanks, Harris, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kerby, Kingsley, Marshall, Mendive, Mitchell, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Nate, Nichols, Okuniewicz, Palmer, Scott, Shepherd, Skaug, Troy, Vander Woude, Weber, Wisniewski, Yamamoto, Young, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS |
2021-04-21 | House | PASSED 48-19-3 AYES |
2021-04-21 | House | House vote to override veto |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:58 p.m. on April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | to enrol |
2021-04-15 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-04-15 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-04-13 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-04-13 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 25-10-0 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-16 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |