ID H0134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- Amends existing law to provide that it shall not be unlawful for any person under the age of 21 to enter or be in a plaza under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that it shall not be unlawful for any person under the age of 21 to enter or be in a plaza under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 14, 2019
2019-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-13SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-12HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-08Senateto House
2019-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 25-9-1
2019-03-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-19Houseto Senate
2019-02-19HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-8-1
2019-02-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback