ID H0131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES - Amends existing law to revise the definition of "principal place of business."
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of "principal place of business."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-24 | House | PASSED -- 54-12-4 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |