ID H0131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2013 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 03/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2013 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 03/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to water to revise extension provisions relating to the time in which a permit holder completes work and applies water to full beneficial use; providing for applicability and to provide that permits pending before the department are entitled to the maximum qualifying extension available under specified law.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to water to revise extension provisions relating to the time in which a permit holder completes work and applies water to full beneficial use; providing for applicability and to provide that permits pending before the department are entitled to the maximum qualifying extension available under specified law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2013 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 03/15/13 |
2013-03-14 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-07 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-1-1 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-28 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2013-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |