ID H0130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ANNEXATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding annexation by cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding annexation by cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-12Houseto Senate
2019-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 55-14-1
2019-03-11HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-07HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-04HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Local Government
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback