ID H0127 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

LOCAL LAND USE PLANNING -- Repeals, amends, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding cities and counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding cities and counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-12HouseRead third time in full as amended -- FAILED 30-38-2
2019-03-11HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-07HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-07HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-07HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-02-27HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-02-27HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-02-27HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Local Government
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback