ID H0122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Without recommendation on concurrence, Held at desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEMP -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent; to provide for research, production, and regulation of hemp; and to provide an exception regarding tetrahydrocannabinols.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent; to provide for research, production, and regulation of hemp; and to provide an exception regarding tetrahydrocannabinols.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseWithout recommendation on concurrence, Held at desk
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Agricultural Affairs for concurrence recommendation
2019-04-01HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-04-01Senateto House
2019-04-01SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-01SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-3-0
2019-03-28SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-27SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-27SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-27SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-27SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-27SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-18Houseto Senate
2019-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-18HouseRules Suspended:
2019-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback