ID H0121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - U.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

POTATOES -- Adds to existing law to provide for a processed potatoes negotiation period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for a processed potatoes negotiation period.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-08HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-02-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback