ID H0118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2019 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2019 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements and restrictions for pretrial risk assessment tools.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements and restrictions for pretrial risk assessment tools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2019 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | to enrol |
2019-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-25 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 60-0-10 |
2019-03-22 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-03-20 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-03-20 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration for concurrence recommendation |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-04 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 66-2-2 |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-02-27 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |