ID H0117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to aeronautics to revise a definition; to establish provisions relating to aerial search operations; to remove language relating to pilot registration, to revise provisions relating to certain fees and certain aircraft registration, to establish provisions relating to personal property tax, to revise provisions relating to certain decals and to the requirement for registration and issuance of certificates, to revise provisions relating to exemptions and to revise provisions relating to the transfer of ownership of an aircraft.
Title
Amends existing law relating to aeronautics to revise a definition; to establish provisions relating to aerial search operations; to remove language relating to pilot registration, to revise provisions relating to certain fees and certain aircraft registration, to establish provisions relating to personal property tax, to revise provisions relating to certain decals and to the requirement for registration and issuance of certificates, to revise provisions relating to exemptions and to revise provisions relating to the transfer of ownership of an aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 19, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-12 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-26 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2013-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |