ID H0117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to state sovereignty and health insurance to provide that certain public laws shall not be enforced by the state of Idaho.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to state sovereignty and health insurance to provide that certain public laws shall not be enforced by the state of Idaho.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-17 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-16 | to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 49-20-1 | |
2011-02-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-08 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-07 | to printing | |
2011-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-07 | House intro |