ID H0112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX -- Adds to existing law to provide for a sales tax rebate on certain road construction materials.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for a sales tax rebate on certain road construction materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-25 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-25 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3 |
2021-02-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |