ID H0111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLE REGISTRATION -- Amends and repeals existing law to remove certain special plate provisions; to revise a fee and the transfer of certain funds from the Plate Manufacturing Account to the Highway Distribution Account and to the State Highway Account.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to remove certain special plate provisions; to revise a fee and the transfer of certain funds from the Plate Manufacturing Account to the Highway Distribution Account and to the State Highway Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 a.m. on March 24, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-10-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |