ID H0107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SALES TAX -- Amends existing law to revise the percentage and allocation of sales tax funds to transportation programs, and establishes a Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program with a percentage of such funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the percentage and allocation of sales tax funds to transportation programs, and establishes a Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program with a percentage of such funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-21SenateRet’d to House
2019-03-21SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- FAILED 16-19-0
2019-03-20SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-15SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-14SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-14SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-14SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-14SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-20Houseto Senate
2019-02-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-18-0
2019-02-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback