ID H0106 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to remove a certain election date for school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to remove a certain election date for school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-02-16SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-02-15Houseto Senate
2021-02-15HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-15HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 45-24-1
2021-02-15HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 15, 2021
2021-02-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-10HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback