ID H0106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2019 Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

RULES OF THE ROAD -- Amends existing law to provide that a driver shall slow down and move over upon approaching certain stationary vehicles displaying flashing lights or emergency hazard lights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a driver shall slow down and move over upon approaching certain stationary vehicles displaying flashing lights or emergency hazard lights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2019 Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-20Houseto enrol
2019-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-20HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 58-9-3
2019-03-19HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-18HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-15HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-15HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-03-15HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence; objection
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
2019-03-13HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-0-3
2019-03-08SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-07SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-07SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-07SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-05SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-25Houseto Senate
2019-02-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-14-1
2019-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback