ID H0102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 19, 2021 Session Law Chapter 261 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 19, 2021 Session Law Chapter 261 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
REAL ESTATE LICENSE LAW -- Amends existing law to remove obsolete language.
Title
Amends existing law to remove obsolete language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 19, 2021 Session Law Chapter 261 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | to enrol |
2021-04-13 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-13 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2021-04-13 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-04-08 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-04-08 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Business for concurrence recommendation |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2021-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |