ID H0102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAX COMMISSION -- Amends existing law to provide that certain actions of the State Tax Commission and the State Board of Equalization will be governed by the Idaho Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain actions of the State Tax Commission and the State Board of Equalization will be governed by the Idaho Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0102/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0102.pdf |