ID H0100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to create the Idaho Opportunity Fund for the Idaho Department of Commerce to assist local governments with economic development.
Title
Adds to existing law to create the Idaho Opportunity Fund for the Idaho Department of Commerce to assist local governments with economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-14 | Senate | PASSED -- 29-6-0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-15 | House | PASSED -- 59-8-3 |
2013-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |