ID H0098 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MARRIAGE -- Amends existing law to provide that a marriage license shall not be issued without order of the court in certain instances, to revise a provision regarding persons under the age of 18 years, to provide for the best interest of the child, and to provide that a marriage license may not be issued in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a marriage license shall not be issued without order of the court in certain instances, to revise a provision regarding persons under the age of 18 years, to provide for the best interest of the child, and to provide that a marriage license may not be issued in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 28-39-3
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-07HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback