ID H0098 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the declaration of policy to include dependents; to revise provisions relating to submission of medical records and medical claims as part of an application for financial assistance; and to provide that findings of indigency shall start on the date necessary medical services are first provided.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the declaration of policy to include dependents; to revise provisions relating to submission of medical records and medical claims as part of an application for financial assistance; and to provide that findings of indigency shall start on the date necessary medical services are first provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 5, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | to enrol |
2013-04-03 | House | Title apvd |
2013-04-03 | House | PASSED -- 65-1-4 |
2013-04-03 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-04-01 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-29 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-29 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2013-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-07 | House | Rusche |
2013-03-07 | House | 70-0-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-07 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2013-03-07 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-05 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-05 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |