ID H0097 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2019 Session Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the duties and liability of certain owners of land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the duties and liability of certain owners of land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2019 Session Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 22, 2019
2019-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2
2019-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-28Houseto Senate
2019-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-07HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback