ID H0096 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2015 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2015 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DRIVER'S LICENSES AND IDENTIFICATION CARDS - Amends existing law to provide for the submittal of compliance extension requests to the United States Department of Homeland Security, to provide that the Idaho Transportation Board and the Idaho Transportation Department are not prevented from taking necessary steps to ensure the acceptance of driver's licenses and identification cards for airline travel and to provide that the department shall report specified information to certain legislative committees.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the submittal of compliance extension requests to the United States Department of Homeland Security, to provide that the Idaho Transportation Board and the Idaho Transportation Department are not prevented from taking necessary steps to ensure the acceptance of driver's licenses and identification cards for airline travel and to provide that the department shall report specified information to certain legislative committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2015 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/11/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 9, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-03 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-20 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-20 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2015-02-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |