ID H0090 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MONUMENTS AND MEMORIALS -- Adds to existing law to provide for the protection of certain monuments and memorials.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the protection of certain monuments and memorials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-09 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-09 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 51-19-0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |