ID H0089 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 65 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HIGHWAYS AND BRIDGES -- Amends current law to designate the portion of U.S. 20 that passes through Idaho as the Idaho Medal of Honor Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends current law to designate the portion of U.S. 20 that passes through Idaho as the Idaho Medal of Honor Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 65 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 8, 2019
2019-03-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-04Senateto House
2019-03-04SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-04SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-22Houseto Senate
2019-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4
2019-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback