ID H0088 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to prohibit the collection of ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit the collection of ballots.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseTake bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-11HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection
2021-02-11HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2021-02-11HousePreviously Read in Full
2021-02-11HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-10HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-05HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback