ID H0085 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME -- Adds to existing law to provide that the State of Idaho shall be exempt from the daylight saving time provisions of federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that the State of Idaho shall be exempt from the daylight saving time provisions of federal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 15-55-0
2019-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-04HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback