ID H0085 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to Fish and Game to authorize the Fish and Game Commission to adopt rules governing a mentored hunting program; to provide an exception to licensure for certain mentored hunters; and to provide that residents who have obtained certain authorizations shall be eligible to receive specified game tags.
Title
Amends existing law relating to Fish and Game to authorize the Fish and Game Commission to adopt rules governing a mentored hunting program; to provide an exception to licensure for certain mentored hunters; and to provide that residents who have obtained certain authorizations shall be eligible to receive specified game tags.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Delivered to Governor on 03/17 | |
2011-03-17 | To Governor | |
2011-03-16 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-14 | To enrol | |
2011-03-11 | to House | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-1-3 | |
2011-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-28 | to Res/Env | |
2011-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-28 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-25 | to Senate | |
2011-02-25 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 52-13-5 | |
2011-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-03 | to Res/Con | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-02 | to printing | |
2011-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-02 | House intro |