ID H0084 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2013 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2013 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to provide that certain abatement of unsafe public school facilities shall be performed in accordance with certain requirements of the Division of Building Safety, to provide that the Idaho Building Code Board shall function as a Board of Appeals, to provide for the issuance of a certificate of occupancy and to provide that the responsibility for ensuring safety of the facility or portion of the facility will be returned to the school district and that responsibility for ensuring certain compliance with building codes will be returned to the authority having jurisdiction.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to provide that certain abatement of unsafe public school facilities shall be performed in accordance with certain requirements of the Division of Building Safety, to provide that the Idaho Building Code Board shall function as a Board of Appeals, to provide for the issuance of a certificate of occupancy and to provide that the responsibility for ensuring safety of the facility or portion of the facility will be returned to the school district and that responsibility for ensuring certain compliance with building codes will be returned to the authority having jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2013 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-02-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:35 a.m. on February 25, 2013 |
2013-02-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-02-19 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-07 | House | PASSED -- 68-1-1 |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |