ID H0076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for electric-assisted bicycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for electric-assisted bicycles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-06Senateto House
2019-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-20Houseto Senate
2019-02-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-02-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback