ID H0075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 73 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES -- Repeals, adds to, and amends existing law to impose a fee on nonresidents for off-highway vehicle travel in Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, adds to, and amends existing law to impose a fee on nonresidents for off-highway vehicle travel in Idaho.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 73 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-06Senateto House
2019-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 22-13-0
2019-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-21Houseto Senate
2019-02-21HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-22-3
2019-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback