ID H0074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for off-highway vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for off-highway vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-06SenateRet’d to House
2019-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 13-22-0
2019-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-21Houseto Senate
2019-02-21HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-16-3
2019-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback