ID H0073 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2021 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2021 SECTION 1-4 & 7-21; 01/01/2022 SECTION 5 & 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2021 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2021 SECTION 1-4 & 7-21; 01/01/2022 SECTION 5 & 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LOCAL GOVERNMENT -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to provide for a uniform system of accounting and financial transparency from local governmental entities and education providers.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to provide for a uniform system of accounting and financial transparency from local governmental entities and education providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2021 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2021 SECTION 1-4 & 7-21; 01/01/2022 SECTION 5 & 6 |
2021-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 26-8-1 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-15 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 54-15-1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 15, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |