ID H0073 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VETERINARIANS - Amends existing law to provide that licensing and application fees are nonrefundable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that licensing and application fees are nonrefundable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
2015-03-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-03-03Houseto Senate
2015-03-03HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-03HousePASSED -- 54-16-0
2015-03-03HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2015
2015-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-02-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-02-04HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2015-02-03HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback