ID H0073 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 173 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 173 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to change the Information Technology Resource Management Council to the Idaho Technology Authority; to revise provisions for appointment of members of the authority; and to revise the authority's general powers and provisions.
Title
Amends existing law to change the Information Technology Resource Management Council to the Idaho Technology Authority; to revise provisions for appointment of members of the authority; and to revise the authority's general powers and provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 173 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:38 a.m. on March 27, 2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | to enrol |
2013-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-25 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2013-03-25 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-20 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-20 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2013-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-07 | House | PASSED -- 56-13-1 |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |