ID H0072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT -- Repeals existing law relating to the Financial Management Technical Development Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law relating to the Financial Management Technical Development Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-02-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on February 13, 2019
2019-02-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-12HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-11Senateto House
2019-02-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-02-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-04Houseto Senate
2019-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-02-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback