ID H0070 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2023 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 03/15/2023 SECTION 1-4, 6 & 7; 09/30/2023 SECTION 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2023 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 03/15/2023 SECTION 1-4, 6 & 7; 09/30/2023 SECTION 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTY INDIGENT SERVICES AND FINANCES -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions affected by the repeal of the County Indigent Program and the Catastrophic Health Care Cost Program.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions affected by the repeal of the County Indigent Program and the Catastrophic Health Care Cost Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2023 Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 03/15/2023 SECTION 1-4, 6 & 7; 09/30/2023 SECTION 5 |
2023-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 15, 2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-02-16 | House | to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Title apvd |
2023-02-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |