ID H0070 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FIREARMS -- Amends existing law to provide that a person convicted of the crime of sexual battery of a minor child sixteen or seventeen years of age shall not have certain rights restored.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a person convicted of the crime of sexual battery of a minor child sixteen or seventeen years of age shall not have certain rights restored.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseU.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-08HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-05HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback