ID H0070 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FIREARMS -- Amends existing law to provide that a person convicted of the crime of sexual battery of a minor child sixteen or seventeen years of age shall not have certain rights restored.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a person convicted of the crime of sexual battery of a minor child sixteen or seventeen years of age shall not have certain rights restored.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-07 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-06 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-05 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-04 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0070/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0070.pdf |