ID H0066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 288 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 288 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Repeals, amends, and adds to existing law to provide for bond and levy election disclosures and penalties for violations.
Title
Repeals, amends, and adds to existing law to provide for bond and levy election disclosures and penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 288 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | to enrol |
2021-04-19 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-19 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 48-20-2 |
2021-04-19 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-04-14 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-04-14 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-03 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-03 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 46-24-0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |