ID H0064 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RESIDENTIAL CARE AND ASSISTED LIVING -- Amends existing law to provide that a residential care or assisted living facility resident shall be entitled to in-person visitation subject to certain precautions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a residential care or assisted living facility resident shall be entitled to in-person visitation subject to certain precautions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-24SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2023-02-24SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2023-02-23Houseto Senate
2023-02-23HouseTitle apvd
2023-02-23HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-5-1
2023-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2023-02-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2023-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback