ID H0062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2019 Session Law Chapter 31 Effective: 01/01/2019 SECTION 1-8; 07/01/2019 SECTION 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OCCUPANCY TAX -- Amends existing law to make property tax relief applicable to either the property tax or the occupancy tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to make property tax relief applicable to either the property tax or the occupancy tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2019 Session Law Chapter 31 Effective: 01/01/2019 SECTION 1-8; 07/01/2019 SECTION 9
2019-02-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on February 20, 2019
2019-02-20HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-15HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-14Senateto House
2019-02-14SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-02-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-05Houseto Senate
2019-02-05HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-02-04HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback