ID H0061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INCOME TAXES -- Adds to existing law to provide an income tax credit for short line railroad infrastructure investment and maintenance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide an income tax credit for short line railroad infrastructure investment and maintenance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-02-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 28-42-0
2019-02-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback