ID H0058 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to establish a procedure for withdrawal of a notice of lien by the Secretary of State and the State Tax Commission.
Title
Amends existing law to establish a procedure for withdrawal of a notice of lien by the Secretary of State and the State Tax Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/H0058.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/H0058.pdf |