ID H0055 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Ret'd to Bus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Ret'd to Bus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends, repeals and adds to existing law relating to the Revised Uniform Unincorporated Nonprofit Association Act.
Title
Amends, repeals and adds to existing law relating to the Revised Uniform Unincorporated Nonprofit Association Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Ret'd to Bus | |
2011-02-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-27 | to Bus | |
2011-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-26 | to printing | |
2011-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-26 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/H0055.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/H0055.pdf |