ID H0053 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AND SCHOOL LANDS -- Amends existing law to authorize the State Board of Land Commissioners to lease state and school lands for oil and gas development for a term of up to ten years.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the State Board of Land Commissioners to lease state and school lands for oil and gas development for a term of up to ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |