ID H0045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DRIVING BUSINESSES -- Amends existing law to reduce the number of hours of classroom instruction and behind-the-wheel training that a new applicant must complete as part of a board-approved apprenticeship training program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to reduce the number of hours of classroom instruction and behind-the-wheel training that a new applicant must complete as part of a board-approved apprenticeship training program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-14Houseto Senate
2019-02-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-02-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback