ID H0037 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 34 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 34 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NURSING -- Amends existing law to provide for discipline if a nurse enters a guilty plea for a relevant crime.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for discipline if a nurse enters a guilty plea for a relevant crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 34 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-03 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-03 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |