ID H0036 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 7 Effective: 02/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- COMMISSION FOR THE BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED -- Relates to the appropriation to the Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 7 Effective: 02/08/2019
2019-02-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:12 a.m. on February 8, 2019
2019-02-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-05HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-04Senateto House
2019-02-04SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-04SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking
2019-01-31SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-30SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-01-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2019
2019-01-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-23HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback