ID H0033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SEARCH WARRANTS -- Amends existing law to provide that an oral statement shall be transcribed if requested.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that an oral statement shall be transcribed if requested.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0
2019-01-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-21HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback